WY SF0064 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcohol licensing; limiting nonresident interests in wholesale licenses for sale of malt beverages; providing exceptions; providing for a temporary license; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wholesale malt beverage distributors-limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Rep. Samuel Krone [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2013-02-19 | Assigned Number SEA0042 | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Did Concur |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-08 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |