WY SF0063 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for donation of big game licenses and for reissuance to disabled veterans; providing for rules and regulations; providing for exemption from fees and other requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game & fish-donation of hunting licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0028 | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0028 | |
2011-02-16 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0028 | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0028 | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-09 | (H06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-20 | (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |