WY SF0062 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - 3rd Reading:Failed 23-34-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to aeronautics; amending reporting requirements for the Wyoming aeronautics commission as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aeronautics reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 23-34-3-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19House3rd Reading:Failed 23-34-3-0-0
2019-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-01-16Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-15SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-15SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback