WY SF0062 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans; extending burial benefits to additional indigent veterans; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Veteran's burial.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] | Rep. Patrick Goggles [D] |
Sen. Kit Jennings [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Grant Larson [R] | Sen. Marty Martin [D] |
Rep. Del McOmie [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. James Petersen [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0025 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0025 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0025 | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0025 | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-24 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-24 | (H08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-16 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |