WY SF0061 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sales and use taxes; providing for amortized payments of sales and use taxes for projects with specified expenditures; providing for distribution of payments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Amortization of sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-11-1-1-0 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-0-1-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-0-1-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-11-1-1-0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-0-1-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |