WY SF0061 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0077
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to revision of inadvertent errors; correcting statutory references and language resulting from inadvertent errors and omissions in previously adopted legislation; correcting obsolete references; repealing fully executed provisions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revisor's bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - H12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - S12 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0077
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0077
2013-02-26 Assigned Number SEA0077
2013-02-26SenateDid Concur
2013-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21HousePassed CoW
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-15HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H12
2013-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-23SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-22SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-22SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S12
2013-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2012-12-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback