WY SF0061 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to health insurance; creating a health care reform demonstration project using the board and administrative structure of the Wyoming health insurance pool as specified; providing for a benefit design committee; authorizing payment of committee members' expenses as specified; providing for the design of the benefits package and plan of operation of the project; providing for eligibility; providing definitions; providing for evaluation of the project comparing project health costs to Medicaid costs if participants had been enrolled in Medicaid; providing for a repeal date; requiring reports; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance reform-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-04 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0042
2010-03-05 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042
2010-03-04 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0042
2010-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0042
2010-03-04 (S) Did Concur
2010-03-04 (S) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-03 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-02 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-03-01 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-26 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-26 (H02) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-25 (H) Rereferred to H02
2010-02-25 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-25 (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-23 (H) Introduced and Referred to H10
2010-02-23 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-22 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-19 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-18 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-17 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-17 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-12 (S) Rereferred to S02
2010-02-12 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-12 (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-10 (S) Introduced and Referred to S10
2010-02-09 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback