WY SF0057 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the state fair; creating the 100th state fair celebration account; authorizing matching fund distributions from the account as specified; providing rulemaking authority; providing a sunset; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
100th state fair celebration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-24 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0045 | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0045 | |
2011-02-22 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0045 | |
2011-02-18 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0045 | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Did Concur | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |