WY SF0055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to optometry; amending optometrists' scope of practice; prohibiting an optometrist from performing specified procedures; amending optometrists' prescription and pharmaceutical drug prescribing authority; directing the application of optometry-related fines and penalties; directing the board of examiners in optometry to determine licensure and continuing education requirements as specified; amending membership on the board of examiners in optometry; repealing provisions that define unlawful conduct; repealing obsolete provisions related to volunteer licensing; authorizing rulemaking; defining terms; removing obsolete language; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometrists practice act amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Recall from Committee failed Pursuant to HR 5-6 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-19 Recall from Committee failed Pursuant to HR 5-6 30-29-1-0-0
2019-02-12HouseH10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
2019-01-18Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-17SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-16SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-16SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback