WY SF0052 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; mandating equivalent benefits and reimbursement related to mental health and substance use services delivered remotely; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurance-mental health and substance use parity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 83 | |
2021-04-05 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0045 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0045 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0045 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0045 | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2021-03-03 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-02-03 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |