WY SF0052 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Chapter No. 138 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Chapter No. 138 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; authorizing the use of electronic pollbooks; authorizing the use of vote centers; establishing a procedure for changing polling locations; providing definitions; making conforming amendments; repealing certification of pollbooks by election judges; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Elections-vote centers and electronic pollbooks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Chapter No. 138 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0053 | |
2015-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0053 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0053 |
2015-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0053 | |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-17 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-17 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-01-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-15 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |