WY SF0050 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to charter schools; authorizing charter schools as local education agencies to receive and apply for federal and state grants; modifying charter school application requirements; modifying charter school funding; modifying reporting requirements; making conforming amendments; repealing provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Charter school amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Rerefer to S12 - Rules |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-01 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |