WY SF0050 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to nicotine products; prohibiting the sale or furnishing of nicotine products to persons under twenty-one years of age as specified; prohibiting the possession and use of nicotine products by persons under twenty-one years of age as specified; providing penalties; repealing specified penalty provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nicotine products-lawful age and penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Adopted SF0050JC001: 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - JCC Report Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Did Not Adopt SF0050JC001: 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-23-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13 Assigned Chapter Number 83
2020-03-13 Governor Signed SEA No. 0053
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0053
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0053
2020-03-11 Assigned Number SEA No. 0053
2020-03-11SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-10HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-09SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-09SenateConcur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0
2020-03-09SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-05House3rd Reading:Passed 37-23-0-0-0
2020-03-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-03HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-27HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2020-02-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0
2020-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-14SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0
2020-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-01-21 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/SF0050.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Engross/SF0050.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Enroll/SF0050.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/SF0050.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#144
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#-164
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#384
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#-498
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#5462
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#554
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#626
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#636
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0050#637

Bill Comments

feedback