WY SF0050 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to financial obligations owed to the state; specifying that a fee may be assessed for a state financial obligation that is submitted to a collection agency to cover the costs of collection; authorizing contracting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Collection of state financial obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2018-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0019 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-28 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2018-02-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |