WY SF0049 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure and sentencing; removing the requirement for the state to consent to deferring criminal prosecution; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Deferral of criminal sentence-amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-25 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |