WY SF0049 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to counties; exempting private schools from county zoning authority as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County zoning authority-private schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-3-1-0-1 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-6-0-0-1 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Assigned Chapter Number 196
2019-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0067
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0067
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0067
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0067
2019-02-25SenateConcur:Passed 25-3-1-0-1
2019-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0
2019-02-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-12HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-6-0-0-1
2019-01-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-16SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-16SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback