WY SF0046 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 101 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; amending various time requirements for proclamations and other election notices; authorizing formation of special hospital districts by county commissioner resolution and election as specified; amending the time for special districts candidate application filings; amending content requirements for general election proclamations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections-notices and resolutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Chapter No. 101 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
2018-03-16 Governor Signed SEA No. 0052
2018-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number 101
2018-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0052
2018-03-10SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0052
2018-03-09 Assigned Number SEA No. 0052
2018-03-09House3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0
2018-03-08House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-07HouseCOW:Passed
2018-03-05HousePlaced on General File
2018-03-05HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2018-02-21HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-20Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2018-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-16SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-15SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0
2018-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback