WY SF0046 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Chapter No. 1 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Chapter No. 1 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Controlled Substances Act; amending procedures and requirements for forfeiting and seizing property; providing definitions; providing immunity for forfeiture actions; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Asset forfeiture-1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Chapter No. 1 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-02-29 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0005 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0005 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0005 |
2016-02-24 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0005 | |
2016-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-18 | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |