WY SF0046 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to charter schools; including specified charter school facilities within school district facilities needs and plans; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School facilities-charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04; No Report Prior to COW Cutoff | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (S04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |