WY SF0045 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 96 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to rural health care districts; providing for the issuance of securities by the trustees of a rural health care district; providing for a method of issuance, sale, form, registration and payment of bonds by rural health care districts; specifying authority of rural health care districts to own hospitals and related facilities; providing for continuation of the tax as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural health care districts-authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - Adopted SF0045JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0045JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Failed 2-28-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 96 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0048
2016-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0048
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0048
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0048
2016-03-02HouseAdopted SF0045JC001: 58-0-2-0-0
2016-03-02SenateAdopted SF0045JC001: 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-29HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-02-29SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-02-29SenateConcur:Failed 2-28-0-0-0
2016-02-29SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2016-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2016-02-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback