WY SF0044 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 37 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 37 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; amending the duties of the office of rural health; amending emergency medical technician licensing provisions; amending emergency medical technician licensing fees and the allocation of licensing fees; providing for temporary emergency medical technician licensure in emergencies; amending the newborn metabolic screening program; repealing the department of health's advisory council; repealing provisions related to the regulation of clinical laboratories and blood banks; repealing misplaced provisions regarding license restrictions; repealing obsolete provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Obsolete statutory language-health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 37 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0022 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0022 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0022 |
2016-02-29 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0022 | |
2016-02-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-24 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-23 | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2016-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-10 | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |