WY SF0044 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state parks and cultural resources; authorizing use of certain fee income for general operations and maintenance of department facilities for a specified period of time; providing for interest to accrue to the account; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State parks-use of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Failed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed COW |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 |
2014-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0044.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/SF0044.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0044.htm |