WY SF0044 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Driskill, Geis, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Meier, Nutting, Peterson, Rothfuss and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hines, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Perkins, Ross, Schiffer and Scott. Ayes 14 Nays 16 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Driskill, Geis, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Meier, Nutting, Peterson, Rothfuss and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hines, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Perkins, Ross, Schiffer and Scott. Ayes 14 Nays 16 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; providing a process for lodging concerns with and for review of competition by government entities with the private sector; requiring reports to the legislature; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Government competition.
Sponsors
Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Leslie Nutting [R] | Rep. Sue Wallis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Driskill, Geis, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Meier, Nutting, Peterson, Rothfuss and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hines, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Perkins, Ross, Schiffer and Scott. Ayes 14 Nays 16 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Case, Hines and Johnson Nayes: Senator(s) Scott Excused: Senator(s) Martin Ayes 3 Nays 1 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-25 | (S07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-27 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0044.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0044.pdf |