WY SF0043 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to anatomical gifts; requiring training on the Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act for coroners and district attorneys; specifying that autopsies or postmortem examinations shall comply with Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Organ donation-training and timely postmortem examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-01 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2018-02-27 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-16 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 26-3-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |