WY SF0042 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; providing for senate confirmation of gubernatorial appointees of water division superintendents; specifying the term of water division superintendents; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water division superintendents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-02-14 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-11 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |