WY SF0041 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to wildlife; increasing the request for funding for animal damage management from the game and fish commission; requiring the game and fish commission to recommend expenditures; clarifying who can request funding; establishing a fee for animal damage management funding; repealing provisions related to the wildlife damage management stamp; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal damage management funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2020-02-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-13Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-12SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0
2020-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback