WY SF0040 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to watercraft; amending the alcohol concentration level that constitutes operation of a motorboat by an intoxicated person; specifying the alcohol concentration levels applicable to the operation of all other watercraft; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operation of motorboat while intoxicated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 152
2019-02-28 Governor Signed SEA No. 0065
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0065
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0065
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0065
2019-02-25SenateConcur:Passed 18-11-1-0-0
2019-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0
2019-02-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-15HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2019-01-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-25SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-25SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback