WY SF0039 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to firemen pensions; providing legislative findings; reducing future cost-of-living increases for certain retired firemen and dependents; specifying application of the act; requiring contributions from employers; providing for loans to employers as specified; providing for the withholding of certain fund distributions to employers failing to repay loans; creating an account; providing for a distribution of fire insurance premium taxes to the account and reducing other distribution of those taxes accordingly; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Firemen's pension plan benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment failed 6-23-0-0-1 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment failed 10-19-0-0-1 (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-17-0-0-1 (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-0-0-1 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment failed 6-23-0-0-1 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment failed 10-19-0-0-1 (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-17-0-0-1 (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-0-0-1 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number 8 | |
2022-03-07 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0006 | |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0006 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0006 |
2022-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0006 | |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-23 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-15 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-0-0-1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |