WY SF0039 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; defining personal and organizational digital identity; establishing requirements for the attribution of acts taken through a digital identity; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital identity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01 Assigned Chapter Number 63
2021-04-01 Governor Signed SEA No. 0024
2021-03-30HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0024
2021-03-29SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0024
2021-03-29 Assigned Number SEA No. 0024
2021-03-29House3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0
2021-03-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-25HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-24HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-24HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2021-03-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-03-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2021-03-12Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-11SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-09SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2021-01-12SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback