WY SF0039 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 68 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to prioritization of municipal solid waste facilities cease and transfer projects; authorizing expenditure of previously appropriated funds; establishing a prioritized list of projects; establishing a maximum amount to be expended on the projects listed; authorizing the department of environmental quality limited discretionary authority to modify the prioritized list; providing definitions; repealing a prior list of priority cease and transfer projects; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cease and transfer priority list.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 68 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0041
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0041
2016-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0041
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0041
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-15SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-0-1-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback