WY SF0038 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure and sentencing; limiting the length of a probation term as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitation on length of probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - Adopted SF0038JC001: 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Adopted SF0038JC001: 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 101
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0050
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0050
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0050
2019-02-20 Assigned Number SEA No. 0050
2019-02-14HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-13SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-12SenateConcur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0
2019-02-12SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-12House3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2019-02-11House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-08HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-07HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-07HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-11SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-11SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-11SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback