WY SF0038 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 35 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; requiring agencies to adopt policies for data collection, access, security and use as specified; directing the state chief information officer to develop guidelines for local governments for data collection, access, security and use; providing a definition; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Data management policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 35 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0018
2016-02-29HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0018
2016-02-29SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0018
2016-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0018
2016-02-26SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-26SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2016-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2016-02-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2016-02-12Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-11SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 27-2-1-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback