WY SF0038 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0097
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; providing for training of coaches and athletic trainers and education of students, parents and guardians regarding head injury and concussion resulting from athletic activities; granting rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School athletics safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0097
2011-03-03 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0097
2011-03-03 Assigned Number SEA0097
2011-03-03 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Petersen, Petroff, Roscoe, Semlek, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Peasley, Quarberg and Shepperson. Excused: Representative(s) Berger, Greear, Illoway, Miller and Pederson. Ayes 52 Nays 3 Excused 5 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-03-03 (H) Adopted SF0038JC01
2011-03-03 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Excused: Senator(s) Geis Ayes 29 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-03-03 (S) Adopted SF0038JC01
2011-03-01 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-02-28 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-02-28 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Perkins Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 1 Nays 29 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-28 (S) Did Not Concur
2011-02-28 (S) Received for Concurrence
2011-02-28 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Jaggi, Kasperik, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Petersen, Petroff, Roscoe, Steward, Stubson, Throne and Wallis. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel, Edmonds, Gay, Hunt, Illoway, Kroeker, Madden, McKim, Miller, Peasley, Quarberg, Semlek, Shepperson, Teeters, Vranish, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Pederson Ayes 42 Nays 17 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-25 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-25 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-24 (H) Amendments Adopted
2011-02-23 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-23 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Burkhart, Connolly, Freeman, Krone, Loucks and Teeters Nayes: Representative(s) Kroeker and Madden Excused: Representative(s) Brechtel Ayes 6 Nays 2 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-23 (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-31 (H) Introduced and Referred to H04
2011-01-19 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-17 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nutting, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Perkins Excused: Senator(s) Nicholas P Ayes 28 Nays 1 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-17 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-14 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-13 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-13 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-13 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-13 (S) Amendments Adopted
2011-01-12 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-12 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Coe, Jennings, Landen and Rothfuss Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-12 (S04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-11 (S) Introduced and Referred to S04
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-12-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback