WY SF0037 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Medical Assistance and Services Act; authorizing payment for services rendered by a licensed podiatrist under the Medical Assistance and Services Act as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Podiatry medical services-Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] |
Sen. Affie Ellis [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-8-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-25-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-25-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 80 | |
2023-02-24 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0040 | |
2023-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0040 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0040 |
2023-02-17 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0040 | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Concur:Passed 22-8-1-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-16 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 37-25-0-0-0 |
2023-02-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-14 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-13 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-1-0-0 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-13 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |