WY SF0037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; creating the Wyoming energy authority by merging the Wyoming pipeline authority and the Wyoming infrastructure authority; repealing superseded provisions; conforming provisions related to the two existing authorities; providing for the transfer of funds and obligations; requiring a study; providing for delayed implementation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Wyoming energy authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 34 | |
2019-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0014 | |
2019-02-13 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0014 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0014 |
2019-02-12 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0014 | |
2019-02-12 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-11 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-06 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2019-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-15 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-26 | Bill Number Assigned |