WY SF0037 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development projects; providing for construction of dams and reservoirs; authorizing construction of designated water projects; describing projects; specifying terms and conditions of funding for projects; providing appropriations; modifying project descriptions and terms of appropriations for various specified prior projects; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus water bill-construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0021 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0021 | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0021 | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-23 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-23 | (H05) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H05 | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-12 | (S05) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S05 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |