WY SF0036 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - 3rd Reading:Failed 19-41-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to corporations; providing for for-profit public benefit corporations; providing definitions; specifying requirements and applicability; imposing duties on boards of directors; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For-profit public benefit corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 19-41-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29House3rd Reading:Failed 19-41-0-0-0
2021-03-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-24HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-23HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-23HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2021-03-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2021-03-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-11Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2021-03-10Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-09SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-04SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-02-03Senate:Rerefer to S07 - Corporations
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2021-01-12SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-01-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback