WY SF0036 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 54 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 54 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to limited liability companies; specifying standards for imposing liability on members and managers; repealing a related provision; and providing for an effective date.
Title
LLC member and manager liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - Adopted SF0036JC001: 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Adopted SF0036JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Adopted SF0036JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 54 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0045 | |
2016-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0045 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0045 |
2016-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0045 | |
2016-03-02 | House | Adopted SF0036JC001: 57-1-2-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Adopted SF0036JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-02-26 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2016-02-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2016-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-22 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-09 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |