WY SF0035 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - 3rd Reading:Failed 27-31-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - 3rd Reading:Failed 27-31-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; requiring the reporting of state of Wyoming employee health care claims data as specified; providing conditions; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Health care claims database reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 27-31-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 27-31-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-28 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2020-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |