WY SF0035 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 193 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 193 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to virtual education provided by public K-12 schools; modifying definitions; modifying requirements for the delivery of virtual education; making conforming amendments; establishing an advisory committee; providing rulemaking authority; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Virtual education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Chapter No. 193 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0057 | |
2017-03-01 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2017-02-28 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0057 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | House | Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-10 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-15 | Bill Number Assigned |