WY SF0035 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Greene, Kasperik, Lubnau, Madden, Miller, Patton, Peasley, Semlek, Steward, Stubson and Teeters. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Brechtel, Burkhart, Byrd, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, McKim, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Davison, Gay, Greear and Shepperson. Ayes 20 Nays 36 Excused 4 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming law enforcement academy; specifying duties of the director of the law enforcement academy; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement academy-director duties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-11 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Greene, Kasperik, Lubnau, Madden, Miller, Patton, Peasley, Semlek, Steward, Stubson and Teeters. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Brechtel, Burkhart, Byrd, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, McKim, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Davison, Gay, Greear and Shepperson. Ayes 20 Nays 36 Excused 4 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-11 (H) Failed 3rd Reading
2011-02-10 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-10 Amendment Failed
2011-02-09 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-04 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-04 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brechtel, Cannady, Greene, Krone, Nicholas B, Peasley and Throne Excused: Representative(s) Brown Ayes 8 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-04 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-31 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2011-01-17 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-17 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Excused: Senator(s) Nicholas P Ayes 29 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-17 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-14 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-13 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-12 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-12 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Burns, Christensen, Esquibel, F., Hicks and Perkins Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-12 (S01) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-11 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-12-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback