WY SF0034 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child welfare; making legislative findings; authorizing the department of family services to operate a program to support care providers' accreditation as qualified residential treatment programs under the federal Family First Act; authorizing the use of a nonprofit entity to operate the program as specified; authorizing payments to be made on behalf of individual care provider organizations; placing limits on payments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child welfare-QRTP accreditation assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |