WY SF0034 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to labor and employment; removing the sunset provision terminating military spouse unemployment benefits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Military spouse unemployment sunset repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-11 - House - Adopted SF0034JC001: 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - Adopted SF0034JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - Adopted SF0034JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0068 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number 110 | |
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2018-03-10 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0068 | |
2018-03-10 | House | Adopted SF0034JC001: 39-19-2-0-0 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Adopted SF0034JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 |
2018-03-10 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Concur:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | House | H08: Rerefer to Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2018-02-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-13 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |