WY SF0034 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming law enforcement academy; specifying duties of the director of the law enforcement academy; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Law enforcement academy-director duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - H Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | House | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-20 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-17 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |