WY SF0033 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
Pending: Joint Agriculture, State and Public Lands & Water Resources Committee
Hearing: Feb 27 @ 8:00 am in Capitol Extension Room E005
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating agricultural extension; requiring consent of the county or district for hiring or firing an agricultural agent as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extension agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 27-0-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2020-02-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-14Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2020-02-13Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-12SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 27-0-3-0-0
2020-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback