WY SF0033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 154 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 154 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; amending provisions related to the election of precinct committeemen and committeewomen; amending the certification and notice requirements for precinct elections; establishing a term of office; amending county central committee meeting requirements; specifying those precinct committeemen and committeewomen who qualify to vote to fill vacancies in office; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Precinct committeeperson elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0033JC001: 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0033JC001: 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0033JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0033JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0033JC001: 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0033JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0033JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 154 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0062 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0062 | |
2015-03-03 | House | Adopted SF0033JC001: 58-1-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Adopted SF0033JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 |
2015-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-10 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-20 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |