WY SF0032 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - (H) Passed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - (H) Passed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; extending the sunset date of the Wyoming investment in nursing program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming investment in nursing extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-23 | (H10) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-15 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |