WY SF0031 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring reports from the University of Wyoming; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Wyoming-land grant mission report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2020-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-14SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
2020-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback