WY SF0031 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans; authorizing planning and design for a skilled nursing center for veterans; providing an appropriation; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Veterans' skilled nursing center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0021 |
2018-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0021 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-28 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-13 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-1-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |