WY SF0031 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 38 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 38 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development projects; authorizing specified level I and level II studies; providing appropriations; requiring reports; providing for reversion of unexpended funds; authorizing unobligated funds to be used to complete other designated projects as specified; authorizing the contract of funds for the office of water programs as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus water bill-planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 38 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2016-03-01 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0027 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0027 |
2016-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0027 | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2016-02-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-24 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-23 | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2016-02-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |